EP2075468 - Pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Automation Partnership York Way Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5WY / GB | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bargh, Adrian Neil Glenogle 9 Heathfield Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 5BW / GB | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07124060.0 | 24.12.2007 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2075468 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/08 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
F04B43/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/10] |
Former [2009/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pumpe | [2009/27] | English: | Pump | [2009/27] | French: | Pompe | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB555326 (CHARLES JOHN HUBER) [X] 1-5,9,14,15 * page 2, lines 95-112; figures 1-6 *; | [DA]US4039269 (PICKERING NORMAN C) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2150644 (MUESZERIPARI MUEVEK LAB) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]US2412397 (HARPER LYNDUS E) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4047844 (ROBINSON THOMAS C) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0450736 (MCGAW INC [US]) [A] * the whole document * |