EP1980569 - Process for preparing high purity corosolic acid and high purity ursolic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENKO CORPORATION 3F Mizushima Building 3-2-11, Uchikanda, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 1010047 / JP | For all designated states Tokiwa Phytochemical Co., Ltd. 158, Kinoko Sakura-shi, Chiba-Ken / JP | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Naoaki 2-34-5 Takara-machi, Katsushika-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Mori, Chihiro 1-5-4 Meiwa Yotsukaido-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Tsutomu 3666-8 Hiragi Sosa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20 Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20 rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07124096.4 | 27.12.2007 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | JP20070121954 | 04.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007121954 | [2008/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1980569 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07J63/00, A61K36/73, A23L1/30, C07C62/32 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
A61K36/73 (EP,US);
A23L33/11 (EP,US);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07J63/008 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30, A23V2250/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von hochreiner Corosolsäure und hochreiner Ursolsäure | [2008/42] | English: | Process for preparing high purity corosolic acid and high purity ursolic acid | [2008/42] | French: | Processus de préparation d'acide corosolique de grande pureté et acide ursolique de grande pureté | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/45] | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006090613 (MARUZEN PHARM CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] *; | EP1859774 [ ] (MARUZEN PHARM CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP1702615 (USE TECHNO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] *; | [Y]CN1629180 ; | [Y]CN1557832 ; | [A]US2005143464 (MATSUYAMA FUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0138] * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 71, Database accession no. 2005-684323, XP002491994 & CN1629180 A 20050622 (YANG Q) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 26, Database accession no. 2005-243255, XP002491995 & CN1557832 A 20041229 (ZHANG S) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09143050 | JP2002255781 | JP2005263650 | US6908632 | JP2002345434 | US2005137259 | - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1993), vol. 41, no. 12, pages 2129 - 2131 | - PLANTA MED., (1991), vol. 57, pages 414 - 416 | - WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2002), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 493 - 495 | - WORLD J. GASTROENTEROL, (2006), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 874 - 879 |