EP1939349 - Laundry machine and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/17] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Son, Chang Woo@LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 02 /
Bae, Sang Hun@LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Chul Jin@LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Dong Hyun@LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 05 /
Son, Young Bok@LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 06 /
Kim Heung Jae@LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | [2017/17] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
Son, Chang Woo LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | ||
02 /
Bae, Sang Hun LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
03 /
Choi, Chul Jin LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Dong Hyun LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
05 /
Son, Young Bok LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
06 /
Kim Heung Jae LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si 641-711, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07150312.2 | 21.12.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | KR20060133847 | 26.12.2006 Original published format: KR 20060133847 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1939349 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1939349 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1939349 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/20, D06F58/28, D06F39/00, D06F33/02 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
D06F58/44 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/18 (EP,KR,US);
D06F39/40 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/203 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/50 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2101/20 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/02 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/04 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/44 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/62 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/24 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/40 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | D06F58/20, D06F58/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Waschmaschine und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2008/27] | English: | Laundry machine and control method thereof | [2008/27] | French: | Machine de blanchisserie et son procédé de commande | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 25.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | IE | 21.12.2017 | LU | 21.12.2017 | MT | 21.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.12.2007 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.12.2007 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3146527 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 12,14 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2558713 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 12,14 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 19 * * page 5, line 6 - line 12 *; | [Y]JPH06233898 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0898009 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, paragraph 18 - column 4, paragraph 21; figure . *; | [X]WO2004058035 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 11 * page 6, line 10 - line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004168343 (PARK SANG HO [KR]) [A] 2-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005086979 (SON KWEON [KR], et al) [Y] 12 * page 2, paragraph 29 - paragraph 30 *; | [A]EP1600545 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1666655 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, paragraph 29 - column 13, paragraph 109; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1696067 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 11-15* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1734170 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 11 * column 5, paragraph 28 - column 6, paragraph 31; figures 1,3 * [Y] 12,14; | [PX]EP1852541 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [PX] 1,9 * page 5, paragraph 27 - page 7, paragraph 39; figures 2,4; claims 11,12,17 *; | [PX]EP1852540 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [PX] 1,9 * claim 12 *; | [PX]EP1852542 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [PX] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1862581 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [PX] 11 * column 5, paragraph 25; figure 2 * |