EP2072497 - Method for manufacturing 2-fluoracyl-3-amino-acrylic acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG BCS-BPA-LP-PL Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07150357.7 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072497 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/16, C07C229/30 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
C07C227/16 (EP,KR,US);
C07C253/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C227/16, C07C229/30 (EP,US);
C07C253/30, C07C255/30 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von 2-Fluoracyl-3-amino-acrylsäure-Derivaten | [2009/26] | English: | Method for manufacturing 2-fluoracyl-3-amino-acrylic acid derivatives | [2009/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de dérivés de 2-fluoracyl-3-amino acide acrylique | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/02] | 04.09.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO03051820 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-9 * examples 1-3 *; | [DA]WO2005042468 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * * claim 1 * * examples 1-3 * * examples 9,10 * * example 12 * * example 14 *; | [A]US2007225280 (ANDERSON KEVIN WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0047] ** paragraphs [0103] , [0104] *; | [Y] - HOJO M ET AL, "ELECTROPHILIC SUBSTITUTIONS OF OLEFINIC HYDROGENS II. ACYLATION OF VINYL ETHERS AND N-VINYL AMIDES", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, NIPPON KAGAKUKAI, TOKYO, JP, (1976), ISSN 0366-7022, pages 499 - 502, XP000196322 [Y] 1-9 * page 503, line 26 - line 31 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.1976.499 | by applicant | EP0608725 | EP1000926 | WO03051820 | WO2005042468 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1996), vol. 37, pages 8751 - 8754 | - RENE ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (1986), vol. 5, pages 419 - 420 |