EP1808467 - Liquid silicone rubber coating composition, curtain airbag and making method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeno, Masayuki, c/o Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Cent. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Mizushima, Hidenori, Silicone-Electronics Mat. Res. Cent. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Ubukata, Shigeru, Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Cent. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Iwata, Mitsuhiro, Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Cent. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [2014/10] |
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
Ikeno, Masayuki, c/o Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Cent. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Mizushima, Hidenori, Silicone-Electronics Mat. Res. Cent. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ubukata, Shigeru, Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Cent. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Iwata, Mitsuhiro, Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Cent. Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/29] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250087.9 | 10.01.2007 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | JP20060005817 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006005817 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1808467 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1808467 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1808467 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/04, D06N3/12 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
D06N3/128 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D183/00 (KR);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/28, C08L2666/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | C09D183/07, D06N3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/28] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssige Silicongummi-Beschichtungszusammensetzung, Vorhang-Airbag und Herstellungsverfahren | [2007/29] | English: | Liquid silicone rubber coating composition, curtain airbag and making method | [2007/29] | French: | Composition liquide de revêtement de caoutchuc de silicone, Coussin gonflable en forme de rideau et methode de preparation | [2013/40] |
Former [2007/29] | Composition liquide de revêtement de caoutchuc de silicone, coussin gonflable en forme de rideau et methode de preparation | Examination procedure | 24.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 12.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1108764 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038] * * examples 1-3 *; | [XDA]US5106933 (KOBAYASHI TAKAOMI [JP], et al) [XD] 1 * column 2, line 20 - column 8, line 20 * * examples 3,4 * [A] 2-3 |