EP1813232 - Deployment catheter for medical implant devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 NW 60th Avenue Miami Lakes, FL 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aruirre, Gus 18710 SW 4th Street Pembroke Pines, FL 33029 / US | 02 /
Cioanta, Iulian 596 Conservation Dr. Weston, FL 33327 / US | 03 /
Couri, Duane 933 NE 199th Street, nr. 207 North Miami Beach, FL 33179 / US | 04 /
Fitzgerald, Eamonn P. 1018 North 32 Avenue Hollywood, FL 33021 / US | 05 /
Harries, Heather Ann Bartholf 310 SW 190 Avenue Pembroke Pines, FL 33029 / US | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250339.4 | 27.01.2007 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | US20060343626 | 31.01.2006 Original published format: US 343626 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813232 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1813232 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/84 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9665 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Einführkatheter für medizinische Implantatvorrichtungen | [2007/31] | English: | Deployment catheter for medical implant devices | [2007/31] | French: | Déploiement de cathéter pour des dispositifs d'implant médical | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | LV | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | LU | 27.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
LU | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9943379 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * [Y] 13,14; | [Y]WO0056248 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * claim - *; | [Y]US6183481 (LEE PETER Y [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 6, line 6 - column 11, line 25; claim - *; | [A]US2002010419 (JAYARAMAN SWAMINATHAN [US]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0119] *; | [Y]US2002072789 (HACKETT STEVEN S [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0036]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | WO9943379 | WO0056248 | US6183481 | US2002010419 | US2002072789 |