EP1813205 - Motor-driven surgical cutting and fastening instrument with loading force feedback [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shelton IV, Frederick E. P.O. Box 373 New Vienna, Ohio / US | 02 /
Ouwerkerk, John N. 3836 Woodford Road Cincinnati, Ohio / US | 03 /
Morgan, Jerome R. 3275 S. Whitetree Circle Cincinnati, Ohio / US | 04 /
Swayze, Jeffrey S. 7047 Birchley Drive Hamilton, Ohio / US | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250380.8 | 30.01.2007 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | US20060343573 | 31.01.2006 Original published format: US 343573 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813205 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1813205 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (KR);
A61B17/02 (KR);
A61B17/072 (KR);
A61B34/76 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Motorbetriebenes chirurgisches Schneide- und Befestigungsinstrument mit Belastungsfeedback | [2007/31] | English: | Motor-driven surgical cutting and fastening instrument with loading force feedback | [2007/31] | French: | Instrument chirurgical motorisé de découpe et de fixation avec une rétroaction de force de charge | [2010/50] |
Former [2007/31] | Taille chirurgicale et instrument d'attache commandés par moteur avec une rétroaction de force de chargement | Examination procedure | 11.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10179252.1 / EP2263567 | EP16180219.4 / EP3106106 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 13.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2007 | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | CZ | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | LT | 08.06.2011 | LV | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | PL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | IS | 08.10.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | IE | 30.01.2012 | LU | 30.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.01.2012 | ||
LU | 30.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 30.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
SE | 08.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5339799 (KAMI KUNIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,8-10,12 * abstract * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 54 * * column 9, line 21 - column 10, line 17 *; | [A]WO9518572 (ALPHA SURGICAL TECHNOLOGIES IN [US], et al) [A] 1,11,12 * page 21, line 17 - page 22, line 32 *; | [DYA]US5465895 (KNODEL BRYAN D [US], et al) [DY] 1,2,8-10,12 * abstract * [A] 11; | [A]US5667517 (HOOVEN MICHAEL DAWSON [US]) [A] 1,11,12* abstract *; | [A]US5954259 (VIOLA FRANK J [US], et al) [A] 1,9-12 * abstract * * column 4, lines 5-57 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 16 *; | [A]WO2004032760 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [A] 1,11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | US5465895 | US5688270 | US5709680 | US6978921 |