EP1818142 - Handle for hand tools with interchangeable heads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herramientas Eurotools, S.A. Antigua Carretera Altube Km. 5,5 Vitoria Alava / ES | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aresti, Egoitz Aramberri Antigua Carretera Altube Km. 5,5 Vitoria-Alava / ES | 02 /
Apodaca, Asier De Castillo Antigua Carretera Altube Km. 5,5 Vitoria-Alava / ES | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250498.8 | 07.02.2007 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | ES20060000287 | 08.02.2006 Original published format: ES 200600287 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1818142 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1818142 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B25G1/10, B25G3/26, B25F1/02, B25G3/18 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
B25G3/18 (EP,ES);
B25F1/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/33] | B25G1/10, B25G3/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Title | German: | Griff für Handwerkzeuge mit auswechselbaren Kopfstücken | [2007/33] | English: | Handle for hand tools with interchangeable heads | [2007/33] | French: | Poignée pour outils manuels à têtes interchangeables | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/11] | 03.02.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.03.2011 | 03.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB1574157 (GARDENA KRESS & KASTNER GMBH); | [Y]EP0057916 (WOLF GERAETE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE3519544 (RUX GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US5168693 (INGVARDSEN SOREN [DK]); | [YA]US5515574 (LARSON TIMOTHY J [US]); | [Y]US6055733 (CHEN YIH-LONG [TW]); | [Y]US6311368 (SARTORI FRANCESCO [IT]) | by applicant | EP0057916 | DE3519544 | US5168693 | US6055733 | US6311368 |