EP1826135 - Carrier capable of hanging from a side of a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LBP Manufacturing, Inc. 1325 South Cicero Avenue Cicero, IL 60804 / US | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, Matthew R. 29 West Birchwood Hindsdale, IL 60521 / US | 02 /
Silverstein, Barry L. 1435 Lawrence Lane Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | 03 /
Wolf, Kurt M. 1035 Cleveland Evanston, IL 60202 / US | 04 /
Hubbard, James A. Jr. 5614 W. 87th Place Oak Lawn, IL 60453 / US | [2010/16] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
Cook, Matthew R. 29 West Birchwood Hindsdale, Illinois 60521 / US | ||
02 /
Silverstein, Barry L. 1435 Lawrence Lane Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | |||
03 /
Wolf, Kurt M. 1035 Cleveland Evanston, Illinois 60202 / US | |||
04 /
Hubbard, James A. Jr. 5614 W. 87th Place Oak Lawn, Illinois 60453 / US | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250566.2 | 13.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | US20060362482 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: US 362482 | US20060362485 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: US 362485 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1826135 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1826135 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1826135 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00, B65D21/02 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
B65D71/0022 (EP);
B65D21/0238 (EP);
B65D2571/00141 (EP);
B65D2571/0037 (EP);
B65D2571/00438 (EP);
B65D2571/0045 (EP);
B65D2571/00512 (EP);
B65D2571/0066 (EP);
B65D2571/00722 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Title | German: | An einer Behälterseite hängender Träger | [2007/35] | English: | Carrier capable of hanging from a side of a container | [2007/35] | French: | Support capable de suspendre un conteneur d'un côté | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10006680.2 / EP2246268 | EP10006681.0 / EP2246269 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | PT | 17.01.2011 | GB | 13.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
GB | 13.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
GB | 13.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2175600 (GRECO LOUIS P) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13,16,17 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 9,20; | [X]US2281592 (O'BRIEN JOSEPH F) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13,16,17 * figures 6,7 *; | [Y]GB2035961 (DOLAN CORRUGATED CONTAINERS LT) [Y] 9,20 * figure - *; | [A]US5850911 (PAKZAD BIJAN [US]) [A] 9,20* figure - *; | [XA]US6068127 (HUNTER ANTHONY L [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13,16,17 * figures 6-13 * [A] 21 | by applicant | US6068127 |