EP1826576 - Trigger architecture, measurement system and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corredoura, Paul L. 1302 Harrison Avenue Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Kurz, Peter, et al Agilent Technologies Sàrl 29, rue de la Gare 1110 Morges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Kurz, Peter, et al Agilent Technologies SARL Rue de la Gare 29 1110 Morges / CH | ||
Former [2009/49] | Pingree, Oliver Norman, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [2007/35] | Pingree, Oliver Norman, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250745.2 | 22.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | US20060363939 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: US 363939 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1826576 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1826576 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01R13/34, G01R13/32, G01R13/02 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
G01R13/0254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/49] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Triggerarchitektur, Messsystem und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | [2007/35] | English: | Trigger architecture, measurement system and method of use | [2007/35] | French: | Architecture de déclenchement, système de mesure et procédé d'utilisation | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4888588 (CASTAGNOZZI DANIEL M [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - line 27 * * column 1, line 63 - line 68 * * column 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *; | [A]US2003220753 (PICKERD JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract *; | [A]US6753677 (WELLER DENNIS J [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract * * column 7, line 30 - line 41 *; | [A]US2004176921 (LACY JOHN C DE [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2007012355 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE], et al) [XP] 1,5,8 * abstract * * page 9, line 6 - line 15 * * page 18, paragraph 2 *; | [E]EP1837664 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [E] 1,5,8* abstract * |