EP1827066 - Electron attachment assisted formation of electrical conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dong, Chun Christine 2288 Boulder Circle Macungie, PA 18062 / US | 02 /
Karwacki, Eugene Joseph, Jr. 5620 Snowdrift Lane Orefield, PA 18069 / US | 03 /
Patrick, Richard E. 273 Golf Road Tamaqua, PA 18252 / US | 04 /
Roberts, David Allen 1948 Wooded Ridge Court Fogelsville, PA 18051 / US | 05 /
Pinschmidt, Robert Krantz, Jr. 2549 Liberty Street Allentown, PA 18104 / US | 06 /
Norman, John Anthony Thomas 709 West Bluff Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 07 /
Ivankovits, John Christopher 1965 Maplewood Lane Allentown, PA 18103 / US | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Muir, Benjamin M. J. Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Muir, Benjamin M. J. Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fuldwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250751.0 | 22.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | US20060775906P | 23.02.2006 Original published format: US 775906 P | US20060481444 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: US 481444 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1827066 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/10 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
H05K3/105 (EP,KR,US);
H01B5/14 (KR);
C23C18/08 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (KR);
H01B17/62 (KR);
H01B17/64 (KR);
H01B5/16 (KR);
H01L21/4867 (EP,KR,US);
H05K2203/087 (EP,KR,US);
H05K2203/1157 (EP,KR,US);
H05K2203/121 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronenanlagerungsunterstützte Erzeugung elektrischer Leiter | [2007/35] | English: | Electron attachment assisted formation of electrical conductors | [2007/35] | French: | Formation de conducteurs électriques assistée par capture d'électrons | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |