EP1835046 - Wear-resistant coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freling, Melvin 40 Old Meadow Road West Hartford, CT 06117 / US | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2007/38] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250918.5 | 06.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | US20060376455 | 15.03.2006 Original published format: US 376455 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835046 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1835046 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, C23C4/06, C23C30/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
C23C4/10 (KR);
C23C4/04 (EP,US);
C23C4/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Verschleissfeste Beschichtung | [2007/38] | English: | Wear-resistant coating | [2007/38] | French: | Revêtement résistant à l'usure | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2007 | AT | 04.01.2012 | BE | 04.01.2012 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | IT | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | MT | 04.01.2012 | NL | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SE | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | IE | 06.03.2012 | LU | 06.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | ES | 15.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.03.2012 | ||
LU | 06.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5929819 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,7,13,15 * abstract * [A] 1-18; | [X]US4728448 (SLINEY HAROLD E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,13,14,16,18 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 40; claims 1,6,7 *; | [X]JPH08117984 (KAWASAKI REFRACTORIES CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,13-18 * abstract *; | [X]DE19700835 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,13-18 * claim 9; table 1 *; | [XY]US5709936 (BESMANN THEODORE M [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 5, line 26 - line 33; claims 1-5 * [Y] 8-12; | [Y]US2004142196 (HAJMRLE KAREL [CA], et al) [Y] 8-12* page 2, paragraph 26; claims 1,5,8,11,15,18,21 * | Examination | US6132175 | US2002119338 |