EP1840551 - Testing components of drive trains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burke E. Porter Machinery Company 730 Plymouth Avenue NE Grand Rapids, MI 49505 / US | [2014/51] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Burke E. Porter Machinery Company 730 Plymouth Avenue NE Grand Rapids, MI 49505 / US | ||
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Geo. Kingsbury Machine Tools Limited Quay Lane Hardway Gosport Hampshire PO12 4LB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kingsbury, Richard G. Lisswood Lodge Plantation Road Liss Hampshire GU33 7QB / GB | 02 /
White, John R. 1 Little Lances Hill Bitterne Southampton Hampshire SO19 4DU / GB | [2014/51] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
Kingsbury, Richard G. Lisswood Lodge Plantation Road Liss Hampshire GU33 7QB / GB | ||
02 /
White, John R. 1 Little Lances Hill Bitterne Southampton Hampshire SO19 4DU / GB | Representative(s) | Moser, Jörg Michael, et al Moser & Götze Patentanwälte Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Moser, Jörg Michael, et al Moser & Götze Patentanwälte Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | McGowan, Cathrine D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251291.6 | 27.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | GB20060006557 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0606557 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1840551 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1840551 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840551 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1840551 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01M13/02 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G01M13/02 (EP,GB,US);
G01M13/025 (EP,GB,US);
G01M15/02 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Testen von Antriebskomponenten | [2007/40] | English: | Testing components of drive trains | [2007/40] | French: | Essai de composants pour ensembles de transmission | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.2011
08.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp System Engineering GmbH Bayernstrasse 17 30855 Langenhagen / DE Opponent's representative Loock, Jan Pieter Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.2011
08.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp System Engineering GmbH Bayernstrasse 17 30855 Langenhagen / DE Opponent's representative Loock, Jan Pieter Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2011/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.2011
ThyssenKrupp Systems Engineering GmbH Bayernstrasse 17 30855 Langenhagen / DE Opponent's representative Wagner, Carsten Wagner Dr. Herrguth Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1 30163 Hannover / DE | 09.08.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.12.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.10.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.02.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.11.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 20.12.2013 | Appeal received No. T0037/14 | 26.02.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | HU | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | LT | 08.09.2010 | LV | 08.09.2010 | MT | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | PL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | IS | 08.01.2011 | PT | 10.01.2011 | IE | 27.03.2011 | LU | 27.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | GB | 27.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2015/29] |
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
HU | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
MT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 27.03.2011 | ||
LU | 27.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GB | 27.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/45] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
HU | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
MT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 27.03.2011 | ||
LU | 27.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GB | 27.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
MT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 27.03.2011 | ||
LU | 27.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GB | 27.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
MT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 27.03.2011 | ||
LU | 27.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GB | 27.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3754437 (KANBEL H, et al); | [A]US4033042 (BENTLY DONALD E); | [A]US5477740 (SHIOYA YOSHITOMO [JP], et al); | [A]DE19826526 (TEAMTECHNIK MASCHINEN UND ANLA [DE]); | [A]US2005081644 (JURANITCH JAMES C [US], et al) | by applicant | US5477740 | Opposition | CH166294 | DE10037412 |