EP1976200 - Network bootstrapping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2009/47] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states British Telecommunications Public Limited Company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Representative(s) | Williamson, Simeon Paul, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Williamson, Simeon Paul, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251413.6 | 30.03.2007 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1976200 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
H04L45/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Netzwerk-Bootstrapping | [2008/40] | English: | Network bootstrapping | [2008/40] | French: | Amorçage de réseau | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/11] | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1653688 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 2,4,7 * * page 2, paragraph 9 - page 3, paragraph 12 * * page 4, paragraph 16 * * page 5, paragraphs 26,27 * * page 6, paragraph 35 - page 7, paragraph 39 * * page 16, paragraphs 102,103 * * claims 1,6,8-10 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1653690 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 2, paragraphs 6-8 * * page 3, paragraph 22 - page 4, paragraph 25 * * page 5, paragraph 34 - page 6, paragraph 42 * * claims 1,5,8-10 * * figures 2-4,7,9 *; | [A] - R. AGGARWAL, K. KOMPELLA, T. NADEAU, G. SWALLOW, "BFD For MPLS LSPs", IETF INTERNET DRAFT, (200606), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/draft-ietf-bfd-mpls-03, (20070720), XP002443438 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 2. - page 3, paragraph 3.1 * * page 7, paragraph 6. * * page 8, paragraph 7. * |