EP1847281 - System and method of controlling a rotary blood pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventrassist Pty Ltd 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NEW SOUTH WALES P.O. Box 1 Kensington, NSW 2052 / AU | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ayre, Peter Joseph 31A Devonshire Street Crows Nest NSW 2065 / AU | 02 /
Mason, David Ajax Street Balwyn North VIC 3104 / AU | 03 /
Karantonis, Dean Michael 41 Mooramie Avenue Kensington NWS 2033 / AU | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co., 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251636.2 | 18.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | AU20060902067 | 20.04.2006 Original published format: AU 2006902067 | AU20060902066 | 20.04.2006 Original published format: AU 2006902066 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847281 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/12, A61M1/10 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
A61M60/824 (EP,US);
A61M60/178 (EP,US);
A61M60/232 (EP,US);
A61M60/422 (EP,US);
A61M60/546 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Steuern einer Rotationsblutpumpe | [2007/43] | English: | System and method of controlling a rotary blood pump | [2007/43] | French: | Système et procédé de contrôle d'une pompe sanguine rotative | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 05.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US6066086 (ANTAKI JAMES F [US], et al) [DY] 3 * figures 4-6,11,12 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, lines 34-67 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 21 *; | [XY]WO0172352 (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,14,15 * figure 8 * * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 11 * * page 8, lines 24-26 * * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 25 * * page 11, lines 9-14 * * page 11, line 32 - page 12, line 34 * * page 13, lines 24-27 * [Y] 3,4; | [DY]WO03057013 (MICROMED TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [DY] 4 * page 6, lines 17-24 * * page 7, lines 1-12 * * page 7, lines 18-25 * * page 8, lines 7-29 * * page 12, line 32 - page 13, line 14 * * figures 8,9 *; | [DX]WO2004028593 (VENTRASSIST PTY LTD [AU], et al) [DX] 1,2,9,11,14,15 * figures 6,7,9 * * page 12, lines 5-23 * * page 15, line 16 - page 16, line 1 * * page 16, line 23 - page 18, line 25 * * page 20, lines 5-9 * * page 21, line 20 - page 22, line 17 * * page 23, line 1 - page 25, line 23 *; | [DX]US6991595 (BURKE DAVID J [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,9,11,14,15 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, lines 31-37 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, lines 20-29 * * column 5, lines 47-53 * * column 6, lines 4-29 * * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 15 *; | [X] - VOLLKRON M ET AL, "Development of a Suction Detection System for Axial Blood Pumps", ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, INC., BOSTON, US, (200408), vol. 28, no. 8, ISSN 0160-564X, pages 709 - 716, XP009087840 [X] 1,14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1525-1594.2004.00011.x | by applicant | US6227797 | WO0172352 | US6443983 | WO03057013 | WO2004028593 | - "Development of a Suction Detection System for Axial Blood Pumps", VOLKRON M ET AL., Artificial Organs, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, INC., (200408), vol. 28, pages 709 - 716 |