EP1909178 - Transactional shared memory system and method of control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2015/15] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aguilera, Marcos K. 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
Karamanolis, Christos 3305 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 03 /
Merchant, Arif 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 04 /
Shah, Mehul A. 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 05 /
Veitch, Alistair 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [2015/15] |
Former [2008/15] | Exell, Jonathan Mark, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07252277.4 | 06.06.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | US20060450987 | 12.06.2006 Original published format: US 450987 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909178 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1909178 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909178 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F12/00, G06F9/54 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G06F9/466 (EP,US);
G06F9/526 (EP,US);
G06F2209/521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/18] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Transaktionales gemeinsames Speichersystem und Steuerverfahren | [2008/15] | English: | Transactional shared memory system and method of control | [2008/15] | French: | Système de mémoire partagée transactionnelle et procédé de commande | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8808571 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 4 - page 9 * * page 13 - page 17 * * page 21 - page 23 * * page 26 - page 27 * * figures 1,2,6,8 *; | [A]US6009426 (JOUENNE FRANCK [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5909574 (MEYER PETER A [CA]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO0131458 (TELLABS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0772136 (INFORMIX SOFTWARE INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | WO8808571 |