EP1873237 - Growth of embryonic stem cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 290 Concord Road Billerica Massachusetts 01821 / US | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sheridan, Steven D. 12 Ledgewood Road Wakefield, MA 01880 / US | 02 /
Gill, Sonia 12 Timberview Drive Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07252565.2 | 25.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | US20060816514P | 26.06.2006 Original published format: US 816514 P | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873237 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, C12N5/08 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Title | German: | Wachstum embryonaler Stammzellen | [2008/01] | English: | Growth of embryonic stem cells | [2008/01] | French: | Croissance de cellules de souche embryonnaire | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 11.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005032208 (OH STEVE KAH WENG [SG], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - NAKAGAWA SHIN-ICHIRO ET AL, "In vitro studies on PGC or PGC-like cells in cultured yolk sac cells and embryonic stem cells of the mouse", ARCHIVES OF HISTOLOGY AND CYTOLOGY, (200007), vol. 63, no. 3, ISSN 0914-9465, pages 229 - 241, XP002449708 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1679/aohc.63.229 |