EP1873875 - Laser-diode pumped solid state laser apparatus, optical scanning apparatus, image forming apparatus and display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | For all designated states National Institutes of Natural Sciences 21-1, Osawa 2-chome, Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8588 / JP | For all designated states Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Makihara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi, Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
For all designated states National Institutes of Natural Sciences 21-1, Osawa 2-chome, Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8588 / JP | |||
For all designated states Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi, Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzudo, Tsuyoshi 4-29-2, Sougodai Natori-shi Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Taira, Takunori, c/o National Institute of Natural Sciences 38, Aza Nishigounaka Myodaijicho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-0867 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Yoichi, c/o National Institute of Natural Sciences 38, Aza Nishigounaka Myodaijicho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-0867 / JP | 04 /
Furukawa, Yasunori, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | 05 /
Matsumura, Sadao, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | 06 /
Matsukura, Makoto, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | 07 /
Nakamura, Osamu, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | 08 /
Watanabe, Shinya, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | 09 /
Miyamoto, Akio, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | [2010/09] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
Suzudo, Tsuyoshi 4-29-2, Sougodai Natori-shi Miyagi / JP | ||
02 /
Taira, Takunori, c/o National Institute of Natural Sciences 38, Aza Nishigounaka Myodaijicho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-0867 / JP | |||
03 /
Sato, Yoichi, c/o National Institute of Natural Sciences 38, Aza Nishigounaka Myodaijicho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-0867 / JP | |||
04 /
Furukawa, Yasunori, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
05 /
Mastumura, Sadao, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
06 /
Matsukura, Makoto, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
07 /
Nakamura, Osamu, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
08 /
Watanabe, Shinya, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
09 /
Miyamoto, Akio, c/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
Suzudo, Tsuyoshi 4-29-2, Sougodai Natori-shi Miyagi / JP | ||
02 /
Taira, Takunori, c/o National Institute of Natural Sciences 38, Aza Nishigounaka Myodaijicho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-0867 / JP | |||
03 /
Sato, Yoichi, c/o National Institute of Natural Sciences 38, Aza Nishigounaka Myodaijicho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-0867 / JP | |||
04 /
Furukawa, Yasunori, C/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
05 /
Mastumura, Sadao, C/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
06 /
Matsukura, Makoto, C/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
07 /
Nakamura, Osamu, C/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
08 /
Watanabe, Shinya, C/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | |||
09 /
Miyamoto, Akio, C/o Oxide Corporation 1747-1, Maginohara Mukawacho Hokuto-shi Yamanashi 408-0302 / JP | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07252620.5 | 28.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | JP20060178884 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006178884 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1873875 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1873875 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873875 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/16, H01S3/06, // H01S3/0941 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H01S3/0941 (EP,US);
H01S3/005 (EP,US);
H01S3/0604 (EP,US);
H01S3/061 (EP,US);
H01S3/0612 (EP,US);
H01S3/0617 (EP,US);
H01S3/0627 (EP,US);
H01S3/09408 (EP,US);
H01S3/1611 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | H01S3/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/18] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Laserdiodengepumpte Festkörper-Laservorrichtung, optische Scanvorrichtung, Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung und Anzeigevorrichtung | [2008/01] | English: | Laser-diode pumped solid state laser apparatus, optical scanning apparatus, image forming apparatus and display apparatus | [2008/01] | French: | Appareil laser à l'état solide pompé par laser à diode, appareil de balayage optique, appareil de formation d'image et appareil d'affichage | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 03.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07307508 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008]; figures 1,4 *; | [X]JPH09172217 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009]; figures 3,7 *; | [A]US5802086 (HARGIS DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1,7,9* column 10, line 47 - column 13, line 36; figure 9 *; | [X]JP2000101178 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figures 2,4a,6 *; | [X]WO03088432 (RAYTHEON CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * pages 9,15,16; figures 1,2,6,7 *; | [X]US2005058173 (VETROVEC JAN [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2005091446 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO2005091448 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH07307508 | JPH09172217 | JP2000101178 |