EP1876440 - Ultra-small angle X-ray scattering measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwasaki, Yoshio c/o Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | 02 /
Yokozawa, Yutaka c/o Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | [2016/15] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
Iwasaki, Yoshio c/o Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | ||
02 /
Yokozawa, Yutaka c/o Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | Representative(s) | Addiss, John William, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07252692.4 | 05.07.2007 | [2008/02] | Priority number, date | JP20060187828 | 07.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187828 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876440 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876440 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/201, G21K1/06 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
G01N23/201 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G01N23/207 (EP,US);
G21K2201/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/15] |
Former [2008/38] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Röntgenstrahlungsmessgerät für Ultra-Kleinwinkelstreuungsmessungen | [2008/02] | English: | Ultra-small angle X-ray scattering measuring apparatus | [2008/02] | French: | Appareil de mesure de diffusion de rayons X aux très petits angles | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 10.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9943009 (OSMIC INC [US]) [Y] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6529578 (TAGUCHI TAKEYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 21 - line 30 * * column 4, line 7 - line 53 * * figures 1,3 *; | [Y]FR2850171 (XENOCS [FR]) [Y] 1,5-8 * page 1 - page 7 * * page 13 * * page 14, line 4 - line 8 * * figure 2 *; | [Y] - ISE ET AL, "X-Ray scattering study of ionic colloidal crystals", CURRENT OPINION IN COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (200105), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 126 - 131, XP002450884 [Y] 1,4-8 * abstract * * page 128 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-0294(01)00068-1 | [Y] - GEHRKE R ET AL, "ULTRASMALL-ANGLE X-RAY SCATTERING AT THE HASYLAB WIGGLER BEAMLINE BW4", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19950201), vol. 66, no. 2, PART 2, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 1354 - 1356, XP000509114 [Y] 5 * page 1355, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1145973 | Examination | EP1462795 | - LICAI JIANG ET AL, "APPLICATION OF MULTILAYER OPTICS TO X-RAY DIFFRACTION SYSTEMS", INTERNET CITATION, (2001), URL: http://www.rigakumsc.com/journal/Vol18.2.2001/Jiang.pdf, (20040721), XP002289275 | - DIAT O ET AL, "Ultra-small-angle X-ray scattering with a Bonse-Hart camera on the high brilliance beamline at the ESRF", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A:ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950315), vol. A356, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0168-9002(94)01253-9, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 566 - 572, XP004009207 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-9002(94)01253-9 | by applicant | WO9943009 | US6529578 | FR2850171 | - M. ISE ET AL., "X-ray scattering of sonic colloidal crystals", CURRENT OPINION IN COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (200105), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 126 - 131 |