EP2017196 - Two pack package with connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutzig, Bodo-Werner Chemin L'Epignau 6 1373 Chavornay / CH | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Millburn, Julie Elizabeth Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Millburn, Julie Elizabeth Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07252888.8 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017196 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
B65D85/1063 (EP);
B65D5/009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verpackung mit zwei Packungen und Verbindungsstück | [2009/04] | English: | Two pack package with connector | [2009/04] | French: | Paquet à deux compartiments avec connecteur | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 28.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8808602 (WIDMANN HORST [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 22; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE9409149U (KRAUTTER HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5344008 (DEBLASIO JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-10 *; | [DA]WO2006079799 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1801031 (JT INT SA [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0014] , [0018] , [0019] , [0024] - [0041]; figures 1-8 * |