EP1884535 - Medical containers and treating method for producing medical containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD. 38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-0031 / JP | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroda, Shin-ichi 2-9-26 Tenjin-cho Kiryu-shi, Gunma 3760052 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Masaru, Daikyo Seiko, Ltd. 38-2 Sumida 3-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 1310031 / JP | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Goddard, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Goddard, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253005.8 | 31.07.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | JP20060209231 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006209231 | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884535 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/12, A61J1/05, // C08L67/02 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
C08J7/123 (EP,US);
A61J1/05 (EP,US);
B29C59/142 (EP,US);
B29C59/165 (EP,US);
C08J7/12 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/42] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Medizinische Behälter und Behandlungsverfahren zur Herstellung medizinischer Behälter | [2008/06] | English: | Medical containers and treating method for producing medical containers | [2008/06] | French: | Conteneurs médicaux et procédé de traitement pour produire des conteneurs médicaux | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0226401 (CEBAL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,10 * claims 1,7 *; | [PX]WO2007022976 (SCHOTT AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * claims 1,17,26 *; | [X]EP1652961 (MITSUBISHI SHOJI PLASTICS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,10 *; | [A]JPH05295655 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |