EP1886645 - Stent graft sealing zone connecting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 NW 60th Avenue Miami Lakes, FL 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Majercak, David C. 519 Madison Drive Stewartsville NJ 08886 / US | 02 /
Park, Jin S. 300 Parsippany Road Apt. 8H Parsippany NJ 07054 / US | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
Majercak, David C. 519 Madison Drive Stewartsville NJ 08886 / US | ||
02 /
Park, Jin S. 300 Parsippany Road Apt. 8H Parsippany NJ 07054 / US | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2008/07] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253049.6 | 02.08.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | US20060503362 | 11.08.2006 Original published format: US 503362 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1886645 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1886645 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886645 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/07 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/848 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2002/065 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/07] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsstruktur für den Versiegelungsbereich eines Stentimplantats | [2008/07] | English: | Stent graft sealing zone connecting structure | [2008/07] | French: | Structure de raccordement de zone de scellement de greffe d'endoprothèse | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP08171168.1 / EP2030592 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2007 | AT | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | CZ | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | ES | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | LV | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | MT | 20.05.2015 | PL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | LU | 02.08.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/22] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5282824 (GIANTURCO CESARE [US]) [X] 1-3,9 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 * [Y] 4-8; | [XY]EP0696447 (CARDIOVASCULAR CONCEPTS INC [US]) [X] 19 * column 11, line 46 - column 12, line 21; figures 1,39 * [Y] 4-6; | [A]WO9836708 (ENDOLOGIX INC [US]) [A] 1* figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5873906 (LAU LILIP [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 11, lines 4-24 * * column 14, lines 34-53 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO0064355 (DRASLER WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 10,12-14 * figure 5 *; | [XY]WO2004017866 (COOK INC [US], et al) [X] 19,20 * figures 1,3,6,8 * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]WO2006076441 (MEDTRONIC VASCULAR INC [US], et al) [X] 10,12-14 * page 9, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 1; figure 11a * [Y] 7,8 | Examination | US5282847 | by applicant | WO2006076441 |