EP1901501 - High capacity campaign system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wireless Services Corp. 1301 4th Avenue, 207 Seattle, WA 98004 / US | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Setlow, Larry A. 2219- 175th Avenue NE; Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253617.0 | 12.09.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | US20060825386P | 12.09.2006 Original published format: US 825386 P | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1901501 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1901501 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | Hochleistungskampagnensystem | [2008/12] | English: | High capacity campaign system | [2008/12] | French: | Système de campagne haute capacité | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02087267 (CELLTICK TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1,11,12,17* page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 13; figures 4,6B *; | [Y]US2004097247 (VILKUNA KIRSTI [FR], et al) [Y] 1,11,12,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * |