EP1901271 - Plasma display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Janghwan c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 16, Woomyeon-Dong Seocho-Gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253622.0 | 12.09.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | KR20060088310 | 12.09.2006 Original published format: KR 20060088310 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1901271 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/288 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
G09G3/2965 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G3/294 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2008/48] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigevorrichtung | [2008/12] | English: | Plasma display apparatus | [2008/12] | French: | Appareil d'affichage à plasma | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0704834 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 13-27 * figures 5-8 *; | [X]US6160531 (CHEN CHERN-LIN [TW], et al) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * figures 4-6 * * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 39 *; | [XY]WO2004097778 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 5-7 * * page 9, line 3 - page 11, line 26 * * figures 5-7 * * page 11, line 25 - line 26 * [Y] 13-27; | [A]EP1507250 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [A] 13-27 * figure 1 * * figures 5-8 ** paragraphs [0016] - [0019] * |