EP1908677 - Meter device and vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2012/08] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suita, Yoshikazu c/o Yamaha Motor Asian Center Co., Ltd 64 Moo 1, Bangna-Trad Rd, Km.21 Tambol Srisa Jorrake Yai Bangsaothong Sub-District Samutprakarn 10540 / TH | 02 /
Worakasemsuk, Pairuch c/o Yamaha Motor Asian Center Co., Ltd 64 Moo 1, Bangna-Trad Rd, Km.21 Tambol Srisa Jorrake Yai Bangsaothong Sub-District Samutprakarn 10540 / TH | [2011/38] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
Suita, Yoshikazu c/o Yamaha Motor Asian Ctr Co Ltd 64 Moo 1, Bangna-Trad Rd, Km21 Tambol Srisa Jorra Bangsaothong Sub-Distr. Samutprakarn 10540 / TH | ||
02 /
Worakasemsuk, Pairuch c/o Yamaha Motor Asian Ctr 64 Moo 1, Bangna-Trad Rd, Km21 Tambol Srisa Jorra Bangsaothong Sub-Distr. Samutprakarn 10540 / TH | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253680.8 | 17.09.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | JP20060270001 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006270001 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1908677 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1908677 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908677 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62J99/00, B60K35/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
B60K2360/33 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/12 (EP,US);
B62K2202/00 (EP,US);
Y10S116/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | B62J39/00, B60K35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | Messvorrichtung und Fahrzeug | [2008/15] | English: | Meter device and vehicle | [2008/15] | French: | Dispositif de compteur et véhicule | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 04.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2007 | AT | 22.02.2012 | BE | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | MT | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | GB | 17.09.2012 | IE | 17.09.2012 | LU | 17.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
LU | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
IE | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 22.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0732679 (HAYASHI TELEMPU KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP1340673 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2006027134 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0732679 | WO2006027134 |