EP1906091 - Flow divider valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cohen, Jeffrey M. 212 Martin Road Hebron, CT 06248 / US | 02 /
Hoke, James B. 63 Shanda La Telland, CT 06084 / US | 03 /
Kozola, Stuart L. 3 Apple Hill Drive Natick, MA 01760 / US | [2008/18] |
Former [2008/14] | 01 /
Cohen, Jeffrey M. 212 Martin Road Hebron, CT 06248 / US | ||
02 /
Hoke, James B. 63 Shanda La Telland, CT 06084 / US | |||
03 /
Kozola, Stuart L. 39 Northview Drive Manchester, CT 06040 / US | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253777.2 | 24.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | US20060527431 | 26.09.2006 Original published format: US 527431 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906091 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Classification | IPC: | F23K5/06, F02C7/228 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
F02C7/228 (EP);
F23K5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ventil zur Flussteilung | [2008/14] | English: | Flow divider valve | [2008/14] | French: | Vanne de répartition de débit | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |