EP2048453 - Solar panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autumn Solar Installations Pty Limited Unit 1, Hallmark Estate 259 Princes Highway Ulladulla NSW 2539 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Autumn Solar Installations Pty Limited Unit 1, Hallmark Estate 259 Princes Highway Ulludulla NSW 2539 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merrett, Stephen Lawrence Unit 1, Hallmark Estate 259 Princes Highway Ulladulla, NSW 2539 / AU | [2011/50] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
Merrett, Stephen Lawrence Unit 1, Hallmark Estate, 259 Princes Highway Ulladulla, NSW 2539 / AU | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253993.5 | 09.10.2007 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2048453 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2048453 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/24, F24J2/46 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
F24S10/73 (EP);
F24S10/72 (EP);
F24S40/10 (EP);
F24S80/30 (EP);
F24S2025/6007 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/52] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sonnenkollektor | [2009/16] | English: | Solar panel | [2009/16] | French: | Panneau solaire | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 16.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 12.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.12.2011 | [2012/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2026117 (SUNWORKS INC, et al) [X] 1-7,10 * page 2, line 32 - line 102; figure - *; | [X]US4067317 (HUBBARD S EUGENE) [X] 1-7,10 * column 9, line 28 - line 58; figure - *; | [X]US4096861 (BOWLES VERNON O) [X] 1,2,5-9 * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 37; figure - *; | [X]US4186033 (BOLING NORMAN L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * column 5, line 33 - line 49 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 7; figure - *; | [X]US4133914 (ZANI DAVID A) [X] 1,5-8 * column 2, line 12 - line 20; figure - *; | [X]US4085728 (TOMCHAK SIGFRID A) [X] 1 * column 3, line 6 - line 16; figure - *; | [A]DE20004502U (BUDERUS HEIZTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,4 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2026117 | US4067317 |