EP1924019 - FEC communication apparatus, communication method and computer readable medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gondo, Shunichi, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ajitomi, Daisuke, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Irie, Yuji, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Matsuzawa, Shigeo, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Ise, Kotaro, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/28] |
Former [2008/21] | 01 /
Gondo, Shunichi, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Ajitomi, Daisuke, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Irie, Yuji, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Matsuzawa, Shigeo, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Ise, Kotaro, c/o Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/21] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254317.6 | 31.10.2007 | [2008/21] | Priority number, date | JP20060311498 | 17.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006311498 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1924019 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1924019 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1924019 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/1835 (US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,US);
H04L1/1845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/36] |
Former [2008/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FEC-Kommunikationsgerät, Kommunikationsverfahren und computerlesbares Medium | [2008/21] | English: | FEC communication apparatus, communication method and computer readable medium | [2008/21] | French: | Appareil de communication, procédé de communication et support lisible sur ordinateur, avec correction d'erreurs en avant (FEC) | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 05.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1180282 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * figures 5-7 ** paragraphs [0021] - [0034] *; | [X]US2003226092 (KIM HYUN-CHEOL [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * figures 3-5 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0068] , [0071] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0078] *; | [X]WO2006061902 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * figures 3-8 *; | [E]US2007300134 (SUGAI TOYOKAZU [JP], et al) [E] 1-4,8,9 * figures 3-8 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0066] * |