EP1935868 - Improved process for the selective (AMM) oxidation of lower molecular weight alkanes and alkanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaffney, Anne Mae 805 Copeland School Road West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 02 /
Han, Scott 39 Easton Court Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Buckley, Guy Julian Rohm and Haas Europe Services ApS - UK Branch European Patent Department 4th Floor, 22 Tudor Street London EC4Y 0AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254977.7 | 20.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | US20060876304P | 21.12.2006 Original published format: US 876304 P | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935868 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1935868 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C57/05, C07C57/07, C07C51/43, C07C253/24 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
C07C253/24 (EP,US);
C07C57/04 (KR);
C07C255/00 (KR);
C07C255/01 (KR);
C07C51/215 (EP,US);
C07C51/252 (EP,US);
C07C51/43 (EP,US);
C07C57/00 (KR);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/24, C07C255/08 (US,EP);
C07C51/215, C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C51/252, C07C57/04 (US,EP);
C07C51/43, C07C57/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/10] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbessertes Verfahren zur selektiven Oxidierung von Alkanen mit geringem Molekülgewicht und Alkane | [2008/26] | English: | Improved process for the selective (AMM) oxidation of lower molecular weight alkanes and alkanes | [2008/26] | French: | Processus amélioré pour l'oxydation sélective (AMM) d'alcanes de poids moléculaire inférieur et alcanes | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 26.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1557406 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-15* examples, claims, paragraphs 28, 46 and 73 * | by applicant | US5281745 | US5380933 | US6043186 | US6043185 | US6383978 | US6403525 | US6407031 | US6407280 | US6461996 | US6472552 | US6504053 | US6589907 | US6624111 | US2005137415 | US2005239643 |