EP1935364 - Instrument soaking container and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Szu-Min 26, Trailing Lvy Irvine, CA 92620 / US | 02 /
Platt, Robert C. 5 Saint Croix Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 03 /
Zhu, Peter C 7912 August Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
Raja, Vishnu R 58 Knollglen Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07255008.0 | 21.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | US20060615279 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 615279 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935364 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, A61L2/18, A61L2/24 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
A61L2/24 (EP,US);
A61B90/70 (EP,US);
A61L2/186 (EP,US);
A61L2/26 (EP,US);
A61L2202/122 (EP,US);
A61L2202/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Instrumentendurchnässungsbehälter und entsprechendes Verfahren | [2008/26] | English: | Instrument soaking container and method | [2008/26] | French: | Récipient de trempage d'instrument et procédé | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4710233 (HOHMANN EUGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 11,12,14-17 * column 8, line 8 - line 32; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9324046 (UNIV SALFORD BUSINESS SERVICES [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9426432 (KEW IMPORT EXPORT INC [US]) [Y] 11,12,14-17 * page 17, line 9 - line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]US5558841 (NAKAGAWA MIKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US5882589 (MARIOTTI BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1-10 * column 2 - column 10; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2005196314 (PETERSEN MICHAEL P [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005239675 (MAKANSI MUNZER [US]) [Y] 15* abstract * | by applicant | US2007231188 |