EP1956621 - Relay switching-on circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Security Solutions & Services GmbH Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oldewurtel, Kassen Trollingerweg 13 71706 Markgröningen / DE | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07290182.0 | 12.02.2007 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1956621 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1956621 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/00 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
H01H47/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/17] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Relais-Einschaltkreis | [2008/33] | English: | Relay switching-on circuit | [2008/33] | French: | Circuit de mise en marche de relais | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 14.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0478289 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 6, line 9 - column 7, line 3; figure 4 *; | [A]JPH08250000 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]GB957803 (PHILIPS ELECTRICAL IND LTD) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 74 - page 3, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]RU2191467 (RAJNIN VALERIJ EFIMOVICH) [A] 1-7 * page 3 * |