EP1820712 - System of driving an element to slide on a guide and platform for engaging an element to be driven to slide on a guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Nationale des Chemins de Fer Français 34, rue du Commandant René Mouchotte 75014 Paris / FR | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Macher, Pascal SNCF Direction du Matériel - MDM 15, rue Traversière 75580 Paris Cédex 12 / FR | 02 /
Sion, Jérome SNCF - EMM de Lorraine 20, rue St Victor 57950 Montigny Les Metz / FR | [2012/04] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
Macher, Pascal SNCF Direction du Matériel - MDM 15, rue Traversière 75580 Paris Cédex 12 / FR | ||
02 /
Sion, Jérome SNCF - EMM de Lorraine 20, rue St Victor 57950 Montigny Les Metz / FR | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Cabinet Bloch & Gevers 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290202.6 | 16.02.2007 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | FR20060001358 | 16.02.2006 Original published format: FR 0601358 | [2007/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820712 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820712 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B61D39/00, F15B15/08, F15B15/14 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
B61D39/002 (EP);
B61D39/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | System zum Antrieb eines auf einer Führung gleitenden Elements und Plattform zur Kupplungsübertragung eines anzutreibenden, auf einer Führung gleitenden Elements | [2007/34] | English: | System of driving an element to slide on a guide and platform for engaging an element to be driven to slide on a guide | [2007/34] | French: | Système d'entraînement d'un élément en coulissement sur un guide et plate-forme de transfert d'embrayage d'un élément à entraîner en coulissement sur un guide | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2007 | AT | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | IE | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | NL | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | LU | 16.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | GB | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LU | 16.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GB | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GB | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GB | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GB | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 25.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2157246 (STRUCTURE FLEX LIMITED) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0888947 (GRANDWAGGON AKTIEBOLAG [SE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1116635 (GRANDWAGGON AKTIEBOLAG [SE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [AD]DE10109482 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [AD] 1-10* abstract * | Examination | FR2038139 | GB2330568 |