EP1826059 - Assembly of a headrest rod on a seat using a sheath equipped with three lugs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre d'Etude et de Recherche pour l'Automobile (CERA) 2, rue Emile Arques 51100 Reims / FR | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dehondt, Thierry 17 Allée Blaise Pascal 51430 Tinqueux / FR | [2010/48] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
Dehondt, Thierry 17 Allée Blaise Pascal 51430 Tinqeux / FR | Representative(s) | Sayettat, Julien Christian STRATO-IP 18, rue Soleillet 75020 Paris / FR | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/48] | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP 18, rue Soleillet 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/39] | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP BL 57 - 14, rue Solleillet 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/35] | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP BL 57 - 14, rue Soleillet F-75020 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290238.0 | 23.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | FR20060001867 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: FR 0601867 | [2007/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826059 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1826059 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/48 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
B60N2/826 (EP);
B60N2/897 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Title | German: | Montage einer Stange für eine Kopfstütze auf einem Sitz mit Hilfe einer Umhüllung, die mit drei Zentrierstiften ausgestattet ist | [2007/35] | English: | Assembly of a headrest rod on a seat using a sheath equipped with three lugs | [2007/35] | French: | Assemblage d'une tige d'appui-tête sur un siège au moyen d'une gaine pourvue de trois ergots | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 21.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | IE | 01.12.2010 | IT | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | LU | 23.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | BG | 01.03.2011 | GB | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
TR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LU | 23.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GB | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
LU | 23.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GB | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GB | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | LT | 01.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3635527 (WEBER LUDWIG) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE19730616 (FAURE BERTRAND SITZTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 5 - line 13 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US6361112 (WU DONALD P H [TW]) [A] 1,7* the whole document *; | [A]FR2823808 (CERA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE102004013979 (JOHNSON CONTROLS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |