EP1832514 - Method and machine for forming and heat-sealing a plastic film on an article such as a sterile dish for the culture of micro-organisms, and article obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements Streb & Weil Rue de Gare- Zone Industrielle 67120 Duttlenheim / FR | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weil, Michel 10 rue Berlioz 67120 Molsheim / FR | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Bezault, Jean Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Bezault, Jean Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290274.5 | 05.03.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | FR20060002022 | 07.03.2006 Original published format: FR 0602022 | [2007/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832514 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65B7/16 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
B65B7/164 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C65/305 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29C66/344 (EP);
B29C66/53461 (EP);
B29C66/8161 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B29C66/849 (EP);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C65/26 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/723 (EP);
B29C66/7352 (EP);
B29C66/919 (EP);
B29C66/929 (EP);
B29C66/949 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Maschine zum Formen und Heissverschweissen einer Kunststofffolie auf einen Gegenstand wie einen sterilen Kasten zur Kultivierung von Mikroorganismen und so erhaltener Gegenstand | [2007/37] | English: | Method and machine for forming and heat-sealing a plastic film on an article such as a sterile dish for the culture of micro-organisms, and article obtained thereby | [2007/37] | French: | Procédé et machine de formage et de thermoscellage d'un film plastique sur un article tel qu'une boite stérile pour la culture de micro-organismes, et article ainsi obtenu | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 15.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH525119 (PALLANA GMBH [CH]); | [A]WO9427868 (WORLD CLASS PACKAGING SYST [US], et al); | [DA]WO02057405 (LEMONNIER JEAN [FR]); | [DA]FR2833608 (LEMONNIER JEAN [FR], et al); | [A]US2003196412 (FOULKE GUY L [US]) |