EP1850641 - Beverage heating method and microwave oven capable of implementing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAGORBRANDT SAS 7, rue Henri Becquerel 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2008/35] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Brandt Industries 7, rue Henri Becquerel 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gatto, Vincent 5-7, rue du Lay 85320 La Bretonniere-la-Claye / FR | 02 /
Perrin, Emmanuel 20 rue Longchamp 85600 St Georges de Montaigu / FR | 03 /
Simon, Christophe 11, rue du Moulin 85670 La Chapelle Palluau / FR | [2007/48] |
Former [2007/44] | 01 /
Gatto, Vincent 5-7, rue du Lay 85320 La Bretonniere-la-Claye / FR | ||
02 /
Perrin, Emmanuel Hameau des 2 rives 11, rue de la Prairie 85600 St Georges de Montaigu / FR | |||
03 /
Simon, Christophe 11, rue du Moulin 85670 La Chapelle Palluau / FR | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2007/44] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290507.8 | 24.04.2007 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | FR20060003799 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: FR 0603799 | [2007/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1850641 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1850641 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/68 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
H05B6/802 (EP);
H05B6/6458 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erhitzen eines Getränks und Mikrowellenherd, der zur Umsetzung dieses Verfahrens eingerichtet ist | [2007/44] | English: | Beverage heating method and microwave oven capable of implementing the method | [2007/44] | French: | Procédé de chauffage d'une boisson et four à micro-ondes adapté a mettre en oevre le procédé | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IE | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | MT | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | LU | 24.04.2010 | BE | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 24.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 24.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 24.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS59115918 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0166997 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 11-13 * figures 1,8,11,12 * [Y] 6; | [XY]EP0289000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 11-14 * figures 4,6,9-12; claim 2 * [Y] 1,2,6-10; | [Y]EP0526297 (GOLD STAR CO [KR]) [Y] 9* page 5, lines 3-12; figure 2 *; | [XY]EP0701387 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,11,12,14 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,7-10 |