EP1854693 - Lateral protection device for means of transport and means of transport comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Societe de Transports de Vehicules Automobiles Immeuble "Le Cardinet" 5, Impasse Chalabre 75017 Paris / FR | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benac, Philippe 29 rue de la République 94220 Charenton le Pont / FR | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée Boîte Postale 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290594.6 | 10.05.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | FR20060004207 | 11.05.2006 Original published format: FR 0604207 | [2007/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1854693 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B61D3/18, B60P7/08 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
B60P7/0876 (EP);
B61D3/18 (EP);
Y02T30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Title | German: | Seitliche Schutzvorrichtung für Transportmittel und Transportmittel, das sie umfasst | [2007/46] | English: | Lateral protection device for means of transport and means of transport comprising same | [2007/46] | French: | Dispositif de protection latérale pour moyen de transport et moyen de transport le comportant | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2705461 (CAMPBELL HARRIS S) [A] 1,16 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 26; figures 1-8 *; | [XA]US2950691 (RICHARD HUBER JOHN) [X] 1-3,8,14,16 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 59 * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 71; figures 1-4,7-9 * [A] 4,12; | [A]US4964347 (LONG RUSSELL L [US], et al) [A] 1,4,7,13-15 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 20; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5749303 (CLOSE JR JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15* column 2, line 18 - line 56; figures 1-4 * | Examination | GB2162879 | by applicant | CH376459 |