EP1990375 - Use of a reverse emulsion of an acrylamide polymer with an acrylic monomer as a stabilising agent and foam reducer, in a method for the grinding of mineral materials and binders in an aqueous medium. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COATEX S.A.S. 35, rue Ampère Z.I. Lyon Nord 69730 Genay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states COATEX S.A.S. 35, rue Ampère, Z.I. Lyon Nord 69730 Genay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mongoin, Jacques Enchuel 69650 Quincieux / FR | 02 /
Jacquemet, Christian 24 allée Henriette 69005 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Suau, Jean-Marc 60 chemin Perrault 69480 Lucenay / FR | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290597.9 | 11.05.2007 | [2008/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990375 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990375 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/02, C09C1/30, C09C1/36, C09C3/04, B01F17/52, B01F17/42, B01F17/00 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
C09C3/041 (EP);
B01D19/0404 (EP);
B01D19/0413 (EP);
C09C1/02 (EP);
C09C1/021 (EP);
C09C1/3018 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B01D19/0404, B01D19/0413 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | Use of a reverse emulsion of an acrylamide polymer with an acrylic monomer as a stabilising agent and foam reducer, in a method for the grinding of mineral materials and binders in an aqueous medium. | [2008/46] | English: | Use of a reverse emulsion of an acrylamide polymer with an acrylic monomer as a stabilising agent and foam reducer, in a method for the grinding of mineral materials and binders in an aqueous medium. | [2008/46] | French: | Utilisation d'une émulsion inverse d'un polymère de l'acrylamide avec un monomère acrylique comme agent stabilisant et réducteur de mousse, dans un procédé de broyage en milieu aqueux de matières minérales et de liants. | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 01.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.07.2010 | CZ | 21.07.2010 | DK | 21.07.2010 | EE | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | IE | 21.07.2010 | IT | 21.07.2010 | LT | 21.07.2010 | LV | 21.07.2010 | MT | 21.07.2010 | NL | 21.07.2010 | PL | 21.07.2010 | RO | 21.07.2010 | SE | 21.07.2010 | SI | 21.07.2010 | SK | 21.07.2010 | TR | 21.07.2010 | BG | 21.10.2010 | GR | 22.10.2010 | ES | 01.11.2010 | IS | 21.11.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 21.07.2010 | |
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
MT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
TR | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 21.07.2010 | |
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
MT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 21.07.2010 | |
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 21.07.2010 | |
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB841127 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [DA] 1-16* the whole document *; | [DA]CA2081831 (MISSISSIPPI LIME COMPANY [US]) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9311183 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [DA]US6136305 (MICHEL-LECOCU NELLY [FR], et al) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2810261 (COATEX SA [FR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2005111153 (ALPHA CALCIT FUELLSTOFF GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2006008657 (OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-16 * page 5, line 15 - line 29; claim 1 *; | [DA]WO2006016036 (COATEX SAS [FR], et al) [DA] 1-16 * page 9, line 5 - line 8; example 8; table 1 * |