EP1857657 - Turbine accessory drive gearbox assembly in an airplane engine such as a jet engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HISPANO SUIZA 18, boulevard Louis-Seguin 92707 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abousleiman, Vincent 6 avenue du Parc 92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
Linet, Hugues 96 Avenue Henri Barbusse 92600 Asnieres / FR | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [2012/38] |
Former [2007/47] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290617.5 | 15.05.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | FR20060004488 | 19.05.2006 Original published format: FR 0604488 | [2007/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1857657 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857657 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/00, H02K5/173, H02K9/22 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
F02C7/32 (EP,US);
B64D33/00 (KR);
F16C35/077 (EP,US);
H02K5/1735 (EP,US);
H02K7/085 (EP,US);
H02K7/1823 (EP,US);
H02K9/223 (EP,KR,US);
F05D2230/642 (EP,US);
F05D2300/121 (EP,US);
F05D2300/133 (EP,US);
F05D2300/5024 (EP,US);
F16C2380/26 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | F02C7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Zubehörgehäuse in einem Flugzeugmotor wie einem Turbinentriebwerk | [2007/47] | English: | Turbine accessory drive gearbox assembly in an airplane engine such as a jet engine | [2007/47] | French: | Boitier d'accessoires dans un moteur d'avion tel qu'un turboréacteur | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2007 | AT | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | IE | 15.05.2013 | LU | 15.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2850876 (WOOD HOMER J) [X] 8,9 * column 6, line 10 - line 23 * * figure 3 *; | [X]JPS61145325 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [X] 8,9 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000002156 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1-10* abstract * |