EP2003798 - Method for feeding an optical sum signal to an optical amplifier, tree-shaped optical network and central station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/51] | Method for feeding an optical sum signal to an optical amplifier, optical amplifier device, tree-shaped optical network and central station | ||
[2009/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krimmel, Heinz-Georg Hoffmannstrasse 28 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Schmidt, Werner Karl Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07290734.8 | 12.06.2007 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003798 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2003798 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2003798 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/17, H04J14/02 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H04B10/296 (EP);
H04J14/0282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/03] |
Former [2010/01] | |||
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zuführen eines optischen Summsignals zu einem optischen Verstärker, baumförmiges optisches Netz und Hauptstation | [2009/45] | English: | Method for feeding an optical sum signal to an optical amplifier, tree-shaped optical network and central station | [2009/45] | French: | Procédé d'envoi d'un signal somme optique à un amplificateur optique, réseau optique arborescent et station centrale | [2009/45] |
Former [2008/51] | Verfahren zum Zuführen eines optischen Summsignals zu einem optischen Verstärker, optische Verstärkervorrichtung, baumförmiges optisches Netz und Hauptstation | ||
Former [2008/51] | Method for feeding an optical sum signal to an optical amplifier, optical amplifier device, tree-shaped optical network and central station | ||
Former [2008/51] | Procédé d'envoi d'un signal somme optique à un amplificateur optique, dispositif d'amplification optique, réseau optique arborescent et station centrale | Examination procedure | 23.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time | 09.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP1768282 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column A * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] * [A] 3,8-10 [Y] 7; | [A]US2004247246 (LEE JEONG-SEOK [KR] ET AL) [A] 3,8-10 * column A * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038] *; | [Y]WO03003636 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [Y] 7 * column A * * page 2, line 20 - line 31 * * page 37, line 23 - line 32 *; | [Y]JP2005184111 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [Y] 7 * column W * | [DA] - CHAE C-J ET AL, "EDFA Transient Control Based on Envelope Detection for Optical Burst Switched Networks", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200501), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 226 - 228, XP011124106 [DA] 1,2,4-6 * column A * * parts I. and II. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2004.837736 |