EP2007151 - Method of selecting between multiple operation modes of providing a broadcast or multicast services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gruber, Markus Kallenbergstrasse 65 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | 02 /
Zeller, Dietrich Sternbergweg 4 71067 Sindelingen / DE | 03 /
Kaminski, Stephen Rückerstrasse 72 73054 Eislingen / DE | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Richardt, Markus Albert Richardt Patents & Trademarks Leergasse 11 65343 Eltville am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 07290759.5 | 19.06.2007 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2007151 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2007151 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W99/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
H04W72/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/1845 (KR);
H04W88/10 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | Auswahlverfahren zwischen mehreren Betriebsmodi für die Bereitstellung eines Rundfunk- oder Multicast-Dienstes | [2008/52] | English: | Method of selecting between multiple operation modes of providing a broadcast or multicast services | [2008/52] | French: | Procédé de sélection entre plusieurs procédés de fonctionnement de fourniture de services de radiodiffusion ou de multidiffusion | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 20.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.05.2009 | BE | 20.05.2009 | CY | 20.05.2009 | CZ | 20.05.2009 | DK | 20.05.2009 | EE | 20.05.2009 | FI | 20.05.2009 | LT | 20.05.2009 | LV | 20.05.2009 | MT | 20.05.2009 | NL | 20.05.2009 | PL | 20.05.2009 | RO | 20.05.2009 | SI | 20.05.2009 | SK | 20.05.2009 | TR | 20.05.2009 | IE | 19.06.2009 | LU | 19.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 20.08.2009 | SE | 20.08.2009 | GR | 21.08.2009 | ES | 31.08.2009 | IS | 20.09.2009 | PT | 20.09.2009 | HU | 21.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
MT | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.06.2009 | ||
LU | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
SE | 20.08.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
HU | 21.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
MT | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.06.2009 | ||
LU | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
SE | 20.08.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
SE | 20.08.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
SE | 20.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
BE | 20.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2009 | ||
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
SE | 20.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 20.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 20.05.2009 | |
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SE | 20.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1729535 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0049]; claim 1 *; | [AD] - TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP RADIO ACCESS NETWORK, "3GPP TS 36.300 V1.0.0: Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall Description; Stage 2 (Release 8)", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION (TS), XX, XX, (200703), vol. 36.300, no. 100, pages 1 - 42, XP002447408 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * | [AD] - MOTOROLA, "Additional results on E-MBMS transmissions", 3GPP R1-071433, (20070326), pages 1 - 9, URL: www.3gpp.org, (20071121), XP002459443 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * | [AD] - ERICSSON, "Spectral efficiency comparison od possible MBMS transmission schemes: additional results", 3GPP R1-071049, (20070212), pages 1 - 4, URL: www.3gpp.org, (20071127), XP002459444 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * | [AD] - NOKIA, "Efficiency comparison of MBMS transmission modes", 3GPP R1-070984, (20070212), pages 1 - 3, URL: www.3gpp.org, (20071127), XP002459445 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * |