EP1881180 - System for ventilating a wall of a combustion chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Aircraft Engines 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2018/28] |
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states SNECMA 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunet, Antoine Robert Alain 217 rue du Gué de Ville 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 02 /
Commaret, Patrice André 4 Allée des Peupliers 77950 Rubelles / FR | 03 /
Hernandez, Didier Hippolyte 38 rue Saint Martin 77720 Quiers / FR | 04 /
Locatelli, David 14 rue des Issues 01170 Gex / FR | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Pichat, Thierry, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/04] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290779.3 | 22.06.2007 | [2008/04] | Priority number, date | FR20060006542 | 19.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0606542 | [2008/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1881180 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1881180 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881180 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/12, F02C7/18, F23R3/26, F02C3/08, F02C3/14, F01D5/08 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
F02C3/08 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F01D5/082 (EP,US);
F02C3/14 (EP,US);
F02C7/18 (EP,US);
F23R3/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | F02C7/18, F23R3/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/01] |
Former [2009/21] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wandbelüftungssystem für die Brennkammer | [2008/04] | English: | System for ventilating a wall of a combustion chamber | [2008/04] | French: | Système de ventilation de paroi de chambre de combustion | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 18.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5555721 (BOURNEUF JOHN J [US], et al) [DX] 1,3,4,10 * abstract * * column 4, lines 10-67 * * column 5, lines 1-36 * * column 6, lines 11-35 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO03098020 (SNECMA MOTEURS [FR], et al) [X] 11,12 * abstract * * page 3, lines 26-36 * * page 4, lines 1-25 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2003167775 (SOECHTING FRIEDRICH O [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]GB2093532 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure - * |