EP1882780 - Device for measuring the resistance of a micropile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jean Marie Renovation, SARL 2 Rue de Croquoison 80420 Flixecourt / FR | [2008/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denis, Jean-Marie 2, rue de Croquoison 80420 Flixecourt / FR | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Louiset, Raphaël Dejade & Biset 35, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | Louiset, Raphael Dejade & Biset 35, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290847.8 | 05.07.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | FR20060006196 | 07.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0606196 | [2008/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1882780 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E02D33/00 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
E02D33/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung des Widerstandes eines Wurzelpfahls | [2008/08] | English: | Device for measuring the resistance of a micropile | [2008/05] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de resistance d'un micropieu | [2008/05] |
Former [2008/05] | Vorrichtung zur Messung des Widerstands eines Wurzelpfahls | Examination procedure | 30.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 29.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0246589 (DELMAG MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 7 - page 14, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0190488 (BALFOUR BEATTY PLC [GB]; MURE NORMAN [GB]; SCOTT JASON [GB]) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 26 - page 8, line 8; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1441076 (JEAN MARIE RENOVATION SARL [FR]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0061]; figure 1 * |