EP1894496 - Tool support presentation plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Import Export Du Velay Zone Industrielle des Prairies 43110 Aurec Sur Loire / FR | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bony, Thierry 69 Rue de la Passementerie 42390 Villars / FR | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2008/10] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3, place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 F-42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290919.5 | 24.07.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | FR20060053484 | 28.08.2006 Original published format: FR 0653484 | [2008/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1894496 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/00, B65D73/00 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B65D73/0064 (EP);
A47F5/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Title | German: | Präsentationsplatte eines Meisselhalters | [2008/10] | English: | Tool support presentation plate | [2008/10] | French: | Plaque de presentation support d' outils | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2647422 (LEFRANC BOURGEOIS COULEURS [FR]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1245502 (ELSAY & RIGA LAB [FR]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10064442 (ROESLER PETER [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29916880U (KLEIN GMBH & CO KG M [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1489022 (OLYMPIA GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20301886U (DICK FRIEDR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2706420 (MULLER & CIE ETS M [FR]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0995694 (EDISON GIOCATTOLI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |