EP2026610 - Method and apparatus for radio link failure recovery in a wireless communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | |||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | |||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | |||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaminski, Stephen Rückertstrasse 72 73054 Eislingen / DE | 02 /
Gruber, Markus Kallenbergstrasse 65 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | 03 /
Bakker, Hajo Alemannenstrasse 30/1 71735 Eberdingen / DE | 04 /
Aydin, Osman Knappenweg 51h 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Grob-Lipski, Heidrun Eichenweg 5 72181 Starzach / DE | 06 /
Keil, Klaus Damaschkestr. 25 73730 Esslingen / DE | 07 /
Sudeep Kumar, Palat 17 Heytsbury Gardens, Grange Park Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 6EE / GB | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Nokia Bell Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Cockayne, Gillian, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07291011.0 | 14.08.2007 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026610 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2026610 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, // H04W36/08, H04W36/38 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W36/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für den Wiederanlauf im Funkverbindungsausfall ("Radio link failure recovery") in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationsnetz | [2009/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for radio link failure recovery in a wireless communication network | [2009/08] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le rétablissement d'échec de liaison radio dans un réseau de transmission sans fil | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2007 | AT | 26.02.2014 | BE | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | PT | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | IE | 14.08.2014 | LU | 14.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.08.2007 | |
AT | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/30] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 14.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 14.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
IS | 26.06.2014 |