EP1902951 - Aircraft propulsion system with integrated pylon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guibert, Thibaud Jean-Baptiste 82 bis Boulevard Diderot 75012 Paris / FR | 02 /
Lefort, Guillaume 37 rue Proudhon 75012 Paris / FR | 03 /
Tesniere, Marc Patrick 24 rue du Grand Orme 91750 Champcueil / FR | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07291018.5 | 16.08.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | FR20060008216 | 20.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0608216 | [2008/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902951 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902951 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/18, B64D29/06, F02K3/06 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B64D27/40 (EP,US);
B64D27/402 (EP,US);
F01D25/28 (EP,US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/49] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antriebssystem mit integriertem Mast für Flugzeuge | [2008/13] | English: | Aircraft propulsion system with integrated pylon | [2008/13] | French: | Système propulsif à pylone intégré pour avion | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 30.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2943449 (ALEXANDER KURTI) [Y] 6,7,12 * column 1, line 17 - line 23 * * column 3, line 13 - line 22; figure 2 * [A] 1,17; | [X]US3848832 (STANLEY M, et al) [X] 1-4,9-11,13,14,16-19 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 51 * * column 2, line 63 - line 68; figures 1-4 *; | [XAY]GB2021696 (BOEING CO) [X] 1-5,9-11,13,14,16-19 * page 3, column 21 - column 107; figures 3,5 * [A] 8,15 [Y] 6,7,12; | [A]WO9302920 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1,17 * abstract *; | [A]FR2873988 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,9,17 * abstract *; | [PA]FR2885877 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [PA] 1,17* page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 3 * | by applicant | GB2021696 |