EP2031598 - System and method of writing data in a flash memory on the basis of additional removable contact pads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gravez, Pierre 34 rue de Fontenay 94130 Nogent sur Marne / FR | 02 /
Guignard, Philippe 8 rue Clément Marot 75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
Marseille, Francois-Xavier 4 Square de Grandchamps 78160 Marly le Roi / FR | 04 /
Thill, Michel 10, rue Tristan Bernard 78340 Les Clayes sous Bois / FR | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Fragnaud, Aude, et al C/o Gemplus-Intellectual Property Department Av du Jujubier, ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat cedex / FR | [2009/10] | Application number, filing date | 07291055.7 | 31.08.2007 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031598 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/10 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
G11C16/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/46] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Schreiben von Daten in einen Flash-Speicher auf Basis zusätzlicher, entfernbarer Kontaktanschlüsse | [2009/10] | English: | System and method of writing data in a flash memory on the basis of additional removable contact pads | [2009/10] | French: | Système et procédé d'écriture de données dans une mémoire flash à base des plots de contact additionnels amovibles | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4565922 (ANDERSON ERIC G [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, lines 42-52; figures 1,3 *; | [A]JPH05152377 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]GB2332981 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 16; figure 4 *; | [A]JP2001358305 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,11* abstract *; | [A]US2007096266 (YU CHEEMEN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0031] , [0038] , [0039]; figures 5,8 * |