EP1903164 - Cover slab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perrin, Olivier 3076 rue des Andélys 76250 La Neuville Chant d'Oiselle / FR | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5, avenue de Saint Cloud BP 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07291066.4 | 05.09.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | FR20060007838 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0607838 | [2008/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903164 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/32 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
E04G21/3204 (EP);
E04G2001/155 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schachtabdeckung | [2008/13] | English: | Cover slab | [2008/13] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour trémie | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE29906036U (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 26; figures 1,2; claims 1-5 * [Y] 2,3,5,6; | [Y]JPH08232463 (SHIBATA HIDEO; SANSHIN KIZAI KK) [Y] 2,3,6 * abstract * * figures 1,2,7 *; | [Y]JPH10238131 (JAPAN STEELS INTERNATL KK) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [A]FR2118199 (AGRANATT SERGE) [A] 1,2,5 * page 1, lines 8-14 * * figures 1,2,4,5 * |