EP1900863 - Process and installation for manufacturing a textile comprising inner layers and device relating to the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asselin-Thibeau 191 Rue des Cinq Voies 59200 Tourcoing / FR | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behlouli, Karim 124 Côte Cable 76490 Saint Gilles De Cretot / FR | 02 /
Louis, Francois 23, rue Fréderic Raux 27370 La Saussaye / FR | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Pontet, Bernard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint Aubin 91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Pontet, Bernard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25, rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/12] | Pontet, Bernard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés SELARL, 25, rue Jean-Rostand, Parc Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07291076.3 | 07.09.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | FR20060008115 | 15.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0608115 | [2008/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900863 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00, D01G25/00, D01G15/46, D04H1/74 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
D01G15/46 (EP);
D01G25/00 (EP);
D04H1/728 (EP);
D04H1/74 (EP);
D04H13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, CZ, DE, FR, IT, LI [2008/48] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zum Herstellen eines textiles Gebildes mit Zwischenlagen und Vorrichtung | [2009/22] | English: | Process and installation for manufacturing a textile comprising inner layers and device relating to the same | [2008/12] | French: | Procédé et installation pour fabriquer un textile comportant des intercouches, et dispositif s'y rapportant | [2008/12] |
Former [2008/12] | Verfahren und Anlage zum Herstellen eines textilen Gebilde mit Zwischenlagen und Vorrichtung | Examination procedure | 25.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 20.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/23] | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH239576D (L. PAYEN & CIE) [X] 1,4,5 * figures 2-4 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, lines 5-65 * * column 4, lines 9-15 *; | [PX]WO2006108363 (ELMARCO SRO [CZ], et al) [PX] 1-11 * figure 2 * * page 4, lines 5-12 * * example - *; | [A]FR2770855 (ASSELIN [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,6 * | by applicant | WO2006108363 | FR2770855 | CH239576 |