EP2048910 - Radio access technology selection in telecommunications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states France Télécom 6, place d'Alleray 75015 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Xiaobao 17 Beech Drive Swindon Wiltshire SN5 5DQ / GB | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07291231.4 | 10.10.2007 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2048910 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (US);
H04W60/00 (US);
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W92/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/52] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Auswahl der Funkzugangstechnologie in einem Telekommunikationssystem | [2009/16] | English: | Radio access technology selection in telecommunications system | [2009/16] | French: | Sélection de la technologie d'accès radio dans un système de telecommunication | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006133311 (DREVON NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]WO2007042974 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0060]; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1739991 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 3-7 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] *; | [A]WO2005114917 (KINETO WIRELESS INC [US], et al) [A] 3-7 * page 8, line 22 - page 10, line 4 *; | [A]EP1420604 (SIEMENS MOBILE COMM SPA [IT]) [A] 10 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] * |