EP1946888 - Device for storing and dispensing continuous work belts for a robotic installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
L'Helgoualch, Carole Denise Marthe 19 bis, rue du Pont Colbert-Bât. D4 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Pereira, Paul Alexandre 51A, rue Monttessuy 91260 Juvisy / FR | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07291630.7 | 27.12.2007 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | FR20070000323 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: FR 0700323 | [2008/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946888 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1946888 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B24B21/18 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
B24B21/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/14] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lagerungs- und Verteilvorrichtung von Endlosförderbändern für eine robotisierte Anlage | [2008/30] | English: | Device for storing and dispensing continuous work belts for a robotic installation | [2008/30] | French: | Dispositif de stockage et de distribution de bandes travaillantes sans fin pour une installation robotisée | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 24.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10156694 (S T S KK) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037]; figures 6,13,16 *; | JPH10156694 [ ]; | [DA]FR2677289 (SNECMA [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 34, Database accession no. 1998-392116, XP002448729 & JPH10156694 A 19980616 (STS KK) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | FR2677289 |